Senate | 05/22/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.188 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.215 | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2023 | referred to governmental operations |