Assembly | 09/14/2023 | signed chap.368 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1415 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7094 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.216 | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2023 | referred to people with disabilities |