Assembly | 08/23/2023 | signed chap.295 | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.965 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6590 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.594 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | rules report cal.594 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | referred to ways and means |