Assembly | 09/09/2024 | signed chap.312 | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1628 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1865B | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.451 | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2024 | print number 6563a | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to higher education | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | reference changed to higher education | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | referred to education |