Assembly | 06/30/2023 | signed chap.151 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1247 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6854 | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.186 | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported |