Assembly | 06/30/2023 | signed chap.152 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1416 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7116 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.218 | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | referred to cities |