Assembly | 07/19/2023 | signed chap.194 | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1388 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6538 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.267 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.267 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules |