Assembly | 07/28/2023 | signed chap.227 | ||
Assembly | 07/27/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1307 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6171 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.462 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.462 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | referred to cities |