Assembly | 09/28/2023 | signed chap.499 | ||
Assembly | 09/19/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1691 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6631 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.530 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | rules report cal.530 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | referred to transportation |