Assembly | 06/05/2023 | substituted by s6885a | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | rules report cal.532 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | print number 6690a | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | referred to real property taxation |