Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted by s6743a | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.722 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | print number 6701a | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | amend and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2023 | referred to local governments |