Assembly | 06/07/2023 | substituted by s1690a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | rules report cal.652 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2023 | amend and recommit to rules 6716a | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | reference changed to banks | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2023 | referred to economic development |