Assembly | 09/20/2024 | signed chap.318 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1912 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9195 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.487 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.487 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to local governments | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | print number 6726a | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | amend and recommit to local governments |