Assembly | 08/28/2024 | signed chap.232 | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1159 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6798A | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.452 | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | print number 6738a | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | amend and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | committed to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.192 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.723 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.723 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported referred to rules |