Assembly | 09/15/2023 | signed chap.406 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1113 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6316 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.173 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | rules report cal.173 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | referred to economic development |