Assembly | 12/22/2023 | signed chap.746 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1686 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6337A | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.391 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.391 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | print number 6779a | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |