Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted by s895b | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | amended on third reading 6789b | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.243 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.243 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | print number 6789a | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |