Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.56 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.616 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.838 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8965A | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.244 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.244 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | print number 6799b | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2023 | print number 6799a | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2023 | amend and recommit to health |