Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted by s5608c | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.488 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | print number 6812c | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | amend and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | reference changed to local governments | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | committed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.193 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.724 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.724 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | print number 6812b | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | print number 6812a | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | referred to local governments |