Assembly | 08/28/2024 | signed chap.229 | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.727 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6320 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.317 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.317 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | referred to environmental conservation |