Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.343 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1838 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6623 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.194 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.725 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.725 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | print number 6834a | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |