Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted by s1684a | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.772 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.772 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | print number 6843a | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend and recommit to housing | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | referred to housing |