Assembly | 11/21/2023 | signed chap.676 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.607 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5487 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.274 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.274 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | referred to governmental employees |