LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A06858
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A06858
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A06858
Action History
Assembly
02/27/2024
amend by restoring to original print 6858
Assembly
01/03/2024
referred to local governments
Assembly
05/19/2023
print number 6858a
Assembly
05/19/2023
amend and recommit to local governments
Assembly
05/15/2023
reference changed to local governments
Assembly
05/08/2023
referred to housing