Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted by s6441b | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | rules report cal.854 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | print number 6871b | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to education | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2023 | print number 6871a | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | referred to education |