Assembly | 05/23/2024 | substituted by s6409a | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.103 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | rules report cal.103 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | print number 6901a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |