Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s6670a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.527 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.527 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | print number 6930a | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to transportation |