Assembly | 10/13/2023 | signed chap.524 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1678 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5731 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.176 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | rules report cal.176 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | referred to economic development |