Assembly | 12/13/2024 | signed chap.559 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1073 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2464B | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.454 | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | print number 6957a | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |