Assembly | 06/07/2023 | substituted by s5444 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.278 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.278 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |