Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1384 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2674 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.455 | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to children and families |