Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.575 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1532 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6644B | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.469 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.469 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | amend and recommit to rules 7016b | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | print number 7016a | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | referred to transportation |