Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.576 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1185 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3613 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.279 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.279 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported referred to ways and means |