Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.344 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.892 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6797A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.197 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.539 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | rules report cal.539 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | print number 7041a | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | referred to real property taxation |