Assembly | 09/28/2023 | signed chap.500 | ||
Assembly | 09/19/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1398 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6802A | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.603 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | rules report cal.603 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | print number 7043a | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | referred to transportation |