Assembly | 07/28/2023 | signed chap.231 | ||
Assembly | 07/27/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1393 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6682A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.470 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.470 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | print number 7061a | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to cities | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | referred to cities |