Assembly | 01/12/2024 | reference changed to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.891 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | rules report cal.891 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | referred to governmental operations |