Assembly | 09/07/2023 | approval memo.6 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | signed chap.356 | ||
Assembly | 09/06/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1314 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5494 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.179 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | rules report cal.179 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | referred to governmental employees |