Senate | 03/27/2024 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | amended on third reading 7166a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.200 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.282 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.282 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | referred to energy |