Assembly | 11/11/2024 | signed chap.447 | ||
Assembly | 11/08/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.812 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7544 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.202 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.732 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.732 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | referred to veterans' affairs |