Assembly | 08/23/2023 | signed chap.303 | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1587 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6907 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO AGING | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.285 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.285 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules |