Assembly | 11/14/2023 | approval memo.19 | ||
Assembly | 11/14/2023 | signed chap.628 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1767 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6896 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.604 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | rules report cal.604 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | referred to ways and means |