LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A07215
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A07215
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A07215
Action History
Assembly
05/14/2024
substituted by s1478
Assembly
05/09/2024
advanced to third reading cal.458
Assembly
05/07/2024
reported
Assembly
02/13/2024
reported referred to ways and means
Assembly
01/03/2024
referred to health