Assembly | 03/25/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.373 | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules |