Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.579 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1168 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6917A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.286 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.286 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | print number 7265a | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend and recommit to judiciary | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | referred to judiciary |