Assembly | 07/25/2024 | signed chap.207 | ||
Assembly | 07/25/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1025 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7007A | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.205 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.407 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.407 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | referred to real property taxation |