Assembly | 06/05/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.447 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | rules report cal.447 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | print number 7331b | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | print number 7331a | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | amend and recommit to science and technology | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | reference changed to science and technology | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental employees |