Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.470 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1306 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6357B | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.72 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | rules report cal.72 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | print number 7341b | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | amend and recommit to children and families | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | amend by restoring to original print 7341 | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | amend and recommit to rules 7341a |