Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.59 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.621 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1737 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9745 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.206 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.473 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.473 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | referred to children and families |