Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.580 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1441 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7448 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.474 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.474 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | referred to children and families |